LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB7
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB7
Compare Versions
SB7 Chaptered September 25, 2016
SB7 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB7 Amended August 19, 2016
SB7 Amended September 4, 2015
SB7 Amended August 31, 2015
SB7 Amended July 16, 2015
SB7 Amended July 7, 2015
SB7 Amended June 18, 2015
SB7 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB7 Chaptered September 25, 2016
SB7 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB7 Amended August 19, 2016
SB7 Amended September 4, 2015
SB7 Amended August 31, 2015
SB7 Amended July 16, 2015
SB7 Amended July 7, 2015
SB7 Amended June 18, 2015
SB7 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare