California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015