|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4848.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Set for hearing August 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4819.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 5706.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 821.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|