California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB734 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 19, 2016
Bill June 2, 2015