LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB734
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB734
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB734
Compare Versions
SB734 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB734 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB734 Amended June 21, 2016
SB734 Amended May 19, 2016
SB734 Amended June 2, 2015
SB734 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB734 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB734 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB734 Amended June 21, 2016
SB734 Amended May 19, 2016
SB734 Amended June 2, 2015
SB734 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare