|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5572.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6365.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 949.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 885.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 648.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|