LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB739
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB739
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB739
Compare Versions
SB739 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB739 Amended August 25, 2016
SB739 Amended May 6, 2015
SB739 Amended April 6, 2015
SB739 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB739 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB739 Amended August 25, 2016
SB739 Amended May 6, 2015
SB739 Amended April 6, 2015
SB739 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare