California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB739 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Amended

Bill August 25, 2016
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015