|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 776, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5443.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6232.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1160.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|