LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB773
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB773
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB773
Compare Versions
SB773 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB773 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB773 Amended June 15, 2016
SB773 Amended May 31, 2016
SB773 Amended June 23, 2015
SB773 Amended June 1, 2015
SB773 Amended April 7, 2015
SB773 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB773 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB773 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB773 Amended June 15, 2016
SB773 Amended May 31, 2016
SB773 Amended June 23, 2015
SB773 Amended June 1, 2015
SB773 Amended April 7, 2015
SB773 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare