California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015