|
07/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4549.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5487.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4054.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3997.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|