LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB815
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB815
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB815
Compare Versions
SB815 Chaptered July 25, 2016
SB815 Enrolled June 29, 2016
SB815 Amended June 9, 2016
SB815 Amended June 2, 2016
SB815 Amended May 3, 2016
SB815 Amended April 11, 2016
SB815 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB815 Chaptered July 25, 2016
SB815 Enrolled June 29, 2016
SB815 Amended June 9, 2016
SB815 Amended June 2, 2016
SB815 Amended May 3, 2016
SB815 Amended April 11, 2016
SB815 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare