California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB815 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 9, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016