Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3998.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3615.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |