California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB824 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016