LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB824
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB824
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB824
Compare Versions
SB824 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB824 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB824 Amended August 18, 2016
SB824 Amended August 15, 2016
SB824 Amended June 21, 2016
SB824 Amended May 31, 2016
SB824 Amended April 11, 2016
SB824 Amended March 15, 2016
SB824 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB824 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB824 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB824 Amended August 18, 2016
SB824 Amended August 15, 2016
SB824 Amended June 21, 2016
SB824 Amended May 31, 2016
SB824 Amended April 11, 2016
SB824 Amended March 15, 2016
SB824 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare