|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 535, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5140.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3848.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3810.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|