California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016