LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB866
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB866
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB866
Compare Versions
SB866 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB866 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB866 Amended June 16, 2016
SB866 Amended March 14, 2016
SB866 Introduced January 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB866 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB866 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB866 Amended June 16, 2016
SB866 Amended March 14, 2016
SB866 Introduced January 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare