|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 585, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5574.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6481.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5957.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4036.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
March 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|