California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 25, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016