LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB873
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB873
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB873
Compare Versions
SB873 Chaptered September 24, 2016
SB873 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB873 Amended August 25, 2016
SB873 Amended August 19, 2016
SB873 Amended June 27, 2016
SB873 Amended April 5, 2016
SB873 Introduced January 14, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB873 Chaptered September 24, 2016
SB873 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB873 Amended August 25, 2016
SB873 Amended August 19, 2016
SB873 Amended June 27, 2016
SB873 Amended April 5, 2016
SB873 Introduced January 14, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare