|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4880.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5713.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5402.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3849.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|