California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB875 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016