LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB875
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB875
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB875
Compare Versions
SB875 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB875 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB875 Amended August 1, 2016
SB875 Amended June 1, 2016
SB875 Amended March 8, 2016
SB875 Introduced January 14, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB875 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB875 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB875 Amended August 1, 2016
SB875 Amended June 1, 2016
SB875 Amended March 8, 2016
SB875 Introduced January 14, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare