|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 536, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5445.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 21. Page 6232.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 5987.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 16. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4127.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3999.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3593.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3192.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Set for hearing March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|