California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016