LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB888
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB888
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB888
Compare Versions
SB888 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB888 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB888 Amended August 19, 2016
SB888 Amended June 29, 2016
SB888 Amended May 31, 2016
SB888 Amended May 11, 2016
SB888 Amended April 25, 2016
SB888 Introduced January 20, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB888 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB888 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB888 Amended August 19, 2016
SB888 Amended June 29, 2016
SB888 Amended May 31, 2016
SB888 Amended May 11, 2016
SB888 Amended April 25, 2016
SB888 Introduced January 20, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare