|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4862.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 2. Page 5713.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 3962.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3591.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|