LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB896
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB896
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB896
Compare Versions
SB896 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB896 Amended June 30, 2016
SB896 Amended May 23, 2016
SB896 Amended April 25, 2016
SB896 Amended March 17, 2016
SB896 Introduced January 21, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB896 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB896 Amended June 30, 2016
SB896 Amended May 23, 2016
SB896 Amended April 25, 2016
SB896 Amended March 17, 2016
SB896 Introduced January 21, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare