California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB896 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016