|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 5889.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 3.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4147.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3609.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|