California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB898 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016