LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB898
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB898
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB898
Compare Versions
SB898 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB898 Amended June 27, 2016
SB898 Amended May 31, 2016
SB898 Amended April 25, 2016
SB898 Amended April 4, 2016
SB898 Introduced January 21, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB898 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB898 Amended June 27, 2016
SB898 Amended May 31, 2016
SB898 Amended April 25, 2016
SB898 Amended April 4, 2016
SB898 Introduced January 21, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare