|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5446.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3630.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|