LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB909
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB909
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB909
Compare Versions
SB909 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB909 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB909 Amended August 19, 2016
SB909 Amended June 27, 2016
SB909 Amended March 29, 2016
SB909 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB909 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB909 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB909 Amended August 19, 2016
SB909 Amended June 27, 2016
SB909 Amended March 29, 2016
SB909 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare