California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB909 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016