|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5325.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5896.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
June 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3801.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3495.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3392.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|