LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB919
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB919
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB919
Compare Versions
SB919 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB919 Amended August 11, 2016
SB919 Amended August 1, 2016
SB919 Amended May 31, 2016
SB919 Amended April 14, 2016
SB919 Amended April 6, 2016
SB919 Amended March 7, 2016
SB919 Introduced January 27, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB919 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB919 Amended August 11, 2016
SB919 Amended August 1, 2016
SB919 Amended May 31, 2016
SB919 Amended April 14, 2016
SB919 Amended April 6, 2016
SB919 Amended March 7, 2016
SB919 Introduced January 27, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare