California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB919 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 7, 2016