04/20/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2016. | |||
04/20/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4352.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 4219.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 384.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |