LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB93
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB93
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB93
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 9, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 18, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 20, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 6, 2016
Compare
Bill
April 4, 2016
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2016
Compare