LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB93
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB93
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB93
Compare Versions
SB93 Chaptered April 20, 2016
SB93 Enrolled April 18, 2016
SB93 Amended April 6, 2016
SB93 Amended April 4, 2016
SB93 Amended February 22, 2016
SB93 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB93 Chaptered April 20, 2016
SB93 Enrolled April 18, 2016
SB93 Amended April 6, 2016
SB93 Amended April 4, 2016
SB93 Amended February 22, 2016
SB93 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare