|
07/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3549.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3420.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|