California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB975 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 27, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2016

Amended

Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016