LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB975
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB975
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB975
Compare Versions
SB975 Chaptered July 1, 2016
SB975 Enrolled June 27, 2016
SB975 Amended March 29, 2016
SB975 Amended March 10, 2016
SB975 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB975 Chaptered July 1, 2016
SB975 Enrolled June 27, 2016
SB975 Amended March 29, 2016
SB975 Amended March 10, 2016
SB975 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare