|
03/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor. Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Ordered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Assembly adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 161.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 92.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6: Senators Mitchell, Leno and Hernandez, Assembly Members Bonilla, Santiago and Bonta. Noes 4: Senators Nielsen and Anderson, Assembly Members Gallagher and Patterson) To print.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Set for hearing February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
February 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
Set for hearing February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
Senator Anderson appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/24/2015
|
Senators Hernandez (Co-Chair), Leno, Mitchell, Nielsen and vacancy appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/23/2015
|
Assembly Members Bonta (Co-Chair), Bonilla, Gallagher, Patterson and Santiago appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 1. Noes 39. Page 77.) Ordered to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 1. Page 89.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 76.) Without reference to committee or file. Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 58.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From printer. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To print. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|