LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX22
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX22
Compare Versions
SBX22 Chaptered March 1, 2016
SBX22 Enrolled February 29, 2016
SBX22 Amended February 22, 2016
SBX22 Amended September 4, 2015
SBX22 Introduced July 6, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SBX22 Chaptered March 1, 2016
SBX22 Enrolled February 29, 2016
SBX22 Amended February 22, 2016
SBX22 Amended September 4, 2015
SBX22 Introduced July 6, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare