LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX22
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX22
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
July 6, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
February 29, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
March 1, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 22, 2016
Compare
Bill
September 4, 2015
Compare